U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 11, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 11, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • July 08, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • July 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.