U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-po-05038-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Vessie
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 23, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Quash ]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order Issue of Summons]
  • June 23, 2022: [Add Disposition Text]
  • June 10, 2022: [Mail Returned - MT]
  • June 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • May 25, 2022: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • May 25, 2022: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.