U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-ap-02003-
  • Case Name: DEEGE v. NEARY et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Close Adversary Case]
  • September 01, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • August 05, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • August 03, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • July 28, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • June 28, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • June 25, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Extend Time - ADV]
May, 2021
  • May 29, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • May 27, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • May 27, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Motion to Extend Time - ADV]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.