U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-bk-10072-
  • Case Name: MYRA RUTH MEDICINE HORSE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
May, 2021
  • May 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • May 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
April, 2021
  • April 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • April 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.