U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-bk-90063-
  • Case Name: BISON BUILDING SYSTEMS, INC.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Final Decree]
  • May 18, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree]
  • May 17, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Final Decree]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • February 07, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Compensation (Ch. 11 or 12)]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Minutes of Hearing Held]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 20, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 16, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 14, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • November 02, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation (Ch11 or 12 - Attorney for Debtor(s) Only)]
  • October 08, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
  • October 08, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • September 22, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Approving Stipulation]
  • September 01, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Continue Hearing]
  • August 30, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • August 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • August 19, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
July, 2021
  • July 31, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
  • July 22, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • July 20, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Approving Stipulation]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Employ]
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion to Employ]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • May 15, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Employ]
  • May 10, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Entered in Error - BK]
  • May 07, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 05, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corp./Part.)]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corp./Part.)]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Add Judge]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Add Judge]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.