U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-ap-09004-
  • Case Name: BOX v. Granite State Management & Resources
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • March 06, 2022: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings]
  • March 04, 2022: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Dismissing Proceedings]
  • March 03, 2022: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held]
January, 2022
  • January 08, 2022: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Trial]
  • January 06, 2022: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 06, 2022: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Trial]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Memorandum of Decision]
  • December 01, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 29, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Memorandum of Decision - AD]
  • November 21, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Trial]
  • November 19, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Trial]
  • November 19, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held Evidentiary]
  • November 19, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 06, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • November 04, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 12, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 09, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 08, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Motion to Extend Time - ADV]
  • October 07, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 07, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Reply to Motion]
  • September 07, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Objection to Motion]
  • September 07, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • September 03, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Motion for Summary Judgment - ADV]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 08, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Appear pro hac vice]
  • June 05, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 04, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 03, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 03, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Trial]
  • June 03, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • May 26, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 24, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
  • May 24, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • May 24, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 21, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: ap Office: 9 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.