U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-bk-10035-
  • Case Name: ERIC ANDREW SPELHAUG and KRISTI LYNN SPELHAUG
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • July 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim]
  • July 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • July 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Objection to Claim]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • June 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • June 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Valuation of Secured Claim]
  • May 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Valuation of Secured Claim]
  • May 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • May 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for Valuation of Secured Claim]
April, 2021
  • April 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • April 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • April 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.