U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-bk-40021-
  • Case Name: THOMAS FRANCIS OCONNELL
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Dismiss Case]
  • June 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion Compelling Turnover of Documents to the U.S. Trustee/Trustee]
  • May 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Trustee's Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7]
April, 2021
  • April 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • April 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • April 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • April 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • April 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • April 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
  • April 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.