U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-ap-02002-
  • Case Name: WOMACK v. GRAHAM
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held Non-evidentiary]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 18, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 14, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Default Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • May 19, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Clerk's Entry of Default]
  • May 19, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Entry of Default]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.