U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-bk-90054-
  • Case Name: BRENDA JOYCE FINLEY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • March 31, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • March 29, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • March 29, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • July 13, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
  • July 11, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • July 09, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • April 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.