U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-ap-01003-
  • Case Name: BILLINGS LODGE, NO. 394, BENEVOLENT AND PROTECTIVE v. Alex et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
October, 2021
  • October 02, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • October 01, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Approving Stipulation]
  • September 30, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Entered in Error - BK]
  • September 29, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Approving Stipulation]
June, 2021
  • June 27, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • June 25, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Vacate Hearing]
  • June 24, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Motion to Vacate Hearing]
  • June 23, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 22, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
  • June 21, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 18, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Response to Motion]
  • June 17, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • June 11, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Reply to Motion]
  • June 01, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Reply to Motion]
  • June 01, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • May 18, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Motion for Remand - ADV]
  • May 17, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Response to Motion]
  • May 17, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Motion for Remand - ADV]
April, 2021
  • April 24, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • April 23, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 22, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Approving Stipulation]
  • April 21, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Consolidate Case]
  • April 21, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • April 19, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Generic Notice - BK]
  • April 19, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Consolidate]
  • April 01, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Motion to Consolidate - ADV]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.