U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-bk-90042-
  • Case Name: MICHAEL LEE THOMAS and LISA ANN THOMAS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
August, 2021
  • August 01, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
  • July 30, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • July 27, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • July 27, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • July 25, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • July 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • July 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Extend Time]
  • July 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • July 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • July 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • July 20, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • July 19, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Extend Time]
  • July 18, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • July 14, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • July 14, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Complaints Deadline]
  • July 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Extend Time]
  • July 09, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • March 31, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.