U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-bk-40014-
  • Case Name: MACKENZIE RAE TUTTLE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • May 03, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
April, 2022
  • April 10, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • April 07, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Turnover of Property]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Turnover of Property]
  • June 24, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
  • June 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion for Turnover of Property]
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • April 26, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • March 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • March 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.