U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-bk-10024-
  • Case Name: DANIELLE ANTOINETTE KENNEDY
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
June, 2022
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • June 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Sale of Property]
  • June 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Sale of Property]
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • June 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • April 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • April 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • April 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2021
  • March 28, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
  • March 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.