U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-bk-10019-
  • Case Name: SAMANTHA RAE DOMINGUEZ-HURT
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • August 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • August 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • September 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • May 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Approving Stipulation]
  • May 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • May 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 20, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • April 16, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
  • March 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.