U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-bk-20035-
  • Case Name: LATTICE BIOLOGICS INC.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trustee's Notice of Proposed Distribution]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Compensation]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • October 18, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • October 07, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • October 06, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Close Adversary Case]
  • October 05, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • September 16, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
June, 2022
  • June 26, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [2004 Examination]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for 2004 Examination]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • May 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Employ]
  • May 24, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion to Employ]
March, 2022
  • March 06, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • March 04, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [2004 Examination]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for 2004 Examination]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • January 11, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Employ]
  • January 06, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion to Employ]
August, 2021
  • August 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • August 15, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Sell]
  • August 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • August 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order (Generic)]
  • August 13, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Sell]
  • August 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Approving Stipulation]
July, 2021
  • July 31, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Shorten Time]
  • July 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Shorten Time]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Shorten Time]
  • July 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(f)]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • June 28, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • March 29, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • March 26, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • March 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Corp./Part.)]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.