U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-bk-20030-
  • Case Name: STEPHANIE D HOUSTON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Stmnt Cmpltn Prsnl Fncl Mgmnt]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • April 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • March 10, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.