U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-bk-90014-
  • Case Name: S & R INVESTMENTS, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Compensation]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • October 05, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Compensation]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • August 23, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • August 10, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • August 08, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Compensation]
  • August 08, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
  • July 14, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • May 02, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Compensation]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Sell]
  • April 27, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Sell]
  • April 21, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate]
  • April 21, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 19, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Vacating Hearing/Resetting]
  • April 19, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 07, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • April 07, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Shorten Time]
  • April 06, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(f)]
February, 2022
  • February 27, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • February 25, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Entered in Error - BK]
  • February 25, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Employ]
  • February 25, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion to Employ]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • January 12, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • January 11, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Compensation]
  • January 10, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Compensation]
December, 2021
  • December 24, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • December 22, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Approving Stipulation]
  • December 15, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • December 14, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • December 03, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Compromise Under Rule 9019]
  • December 01, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • October 07, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Employ]
  • October 06, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion to Employ]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 08, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 05, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • September 05, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Sell]
  • September 03, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Compensation]
  • September 03, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Sell]
August, 2021
  • August 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • August 20, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to File Claim After Claims Bar Date]
  • August 19, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order (Generic)]
  • August 19, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [File Claim After Claims Bar Date]
  • August 18, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to File Claim After Claims Bar Date]
  • August 16, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • August 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(f)]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 28, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order (Generic)]
  • June 13, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation]
  • June 13, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 11, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Approving Stipulation]
  • June 11, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Generic Motion]
  • June 11, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Assume/Reject Lease]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Minutes of Hearing Held]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • May 06, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • May 05, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • May 05, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • May 04, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Employ]
  • May 03, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • May 03, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Employ]
  • May 03, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order (Generic)]
  • May 03, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Generic Motion]
  • May 01, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Response to Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Generic Motion - BK]
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Assume/Reject Lease]
March, 2021
  • March 20, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • March 20, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice]
  • March 18, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Generic Notice - BK]
  • March 18, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • March 10, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 10, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • March 10, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Employ]
  • March 10, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • March 08, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Corp./Part.)]
  • March 08, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • March 06, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Generic Motion]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Turnover of Property]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Appoint Trustee]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 [Generic Motion]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 [Turnover of Property]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 [Appoint Trustee]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order (Generic)]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 [Order (Generic)]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 [Minutes of Hearing Held]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.