U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-bk-90029-
  • Case Name: SAMANTHA LOREN STATON
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • June 17, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 15, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 03, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application of Chapter 7 fee waiver under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • March 01, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
  • March 01, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • March 01, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Application/Motion for Chapter 7 Fee Waiver Under USC 28:1930(f)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.