U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-bk-20022-
  • Case Name: ERIKA HALE and ERIC HALE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Trustee Payment Under 11 U.S.C. 330(e) Processed]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
April, 2021
  • April 18, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • April 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
  • March 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • March 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Add Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.