U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-bk-90027-
  • Case Name: DONALD DARIEN CHASE and SUSANNA LYNN CHASE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [ BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Approving Modification of Plan]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Modify Plan]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
  • November 03, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Plan-all chapters (modified after confirmation)]
  • November 03, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Compel - BK]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim]
  • May 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • May 11, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • May 10, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 05, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim]
  • May 03, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • May 01, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 03, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 03, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • March 01, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 01, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
  • March 01, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.