U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-ap-01001-
  • Case Name: WOMACK v. MULLIN
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 08, 2023: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 04, 2023: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
October, 2022
  • October 01, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 28, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • July 26, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • July 26, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 28, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 27, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • April 27, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 24, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 22, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 05, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • February 02, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order (Generic)]
  • January 07, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney]
  • January 05, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Withdraw As Attorney For Debtor(s)]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Withdraw As Attorney For Debtor(s)]
  • December 10, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 08, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • December 08, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held Non-evidentiary]
October, 2021
  • October 31, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • October 29, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Continue Hearing]
  • October 27, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 01, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • September 01, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV]
  • August 30, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • July 20, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Continue Hearing]
  • July 12, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 22, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • June 10, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Extend Time]
  • May 12, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Entry of Default]
  • May 10, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • May 10, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Entry of Default]
April, 2021
  • April 10, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 08, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Extend Time]
  • April 06, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • March 24, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Extend Time]
  • March 23, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.