U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-ap-02001-
  • Case Name: WOMACK v. HELM
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - ADV]
  • March 25, 2022: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice]
  • March 23, 2022: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Notice - BK]
  • March 12, 2022: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 11, 2022: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Close Adversary Case]
  • March 11, 2022: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Hearing Terminated - Text Only]
  • March 10, 2022: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • December 01, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Default Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Minutes of Hearing Held Non-evidentiary]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 18, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • October 15, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Default Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Generic Notice - ADV]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 24, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Clerk's Entry of Default]
  • March 24, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Motion for Entry of Default]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: ap Office: 2 Chapter: Trustee: WOMACK, JOSEPH V. [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.