U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-bk-10010-
  • Case Name: COULEE HILL RANCH, INC.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Compensation]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • October 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
  • October 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation (Other Professionals)]
December, 2021
  • December 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application for Compensation]
  • December 10, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order on Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion for Compensation for Trustee]
  • November 04, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Confirm Plan]
  • November 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan]
  • November 02, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Minutes of Hearing Held Non-evidentiary]
September, 2021
  • September 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • September 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • September 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Continue Hearing]
  • September 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • September 22, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Extend Time]
  • September 21, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • September 01, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Continue Hearing]
  • August 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • August 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • August 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Employ]
  • August 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion to Employ]
July, 2021
  • July 17, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • July 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Continue Hearing]
  • July 14, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 26, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • June 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order (Generic)]
  • June 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • June 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Continue Hearing]
  • June 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • June 09, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Generic Application - BK]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • May 10, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Employ]
  • May 07, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • May 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 04, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Employ]
  • April 08, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Generic Motion]
  • April 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Generic Motion - BK]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: PATTEN, JAMES A. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • March 30, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • March 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: PATTEN, JAMES A. [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • March 29, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • March 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: PATTEN, JAMES A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 13, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • March 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: PATTEN, JAMES A. [Chapter 11 Subchapter V Scheduling Order]
  • March 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Chapter 11 Subchapter V Scheduling Order]
February, 2021
  • February 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: PATTEN, JAMES A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • February 27, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: PATTEN, JAMES A. [Employ]
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Employ]
  • February 06, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 04, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corp./Part.)]
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Add Judge]
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Add Judge]
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion to Employ]
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.