U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-bk-90013
  • Case Name: JOHN PATRICK STOKES
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Final Decree/Close Bankruptcy Case]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic - BK]
July, 2021
  • July 24, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • July 22, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
June, 2021
  • June 05, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Referral of Appeal]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Transmittal Memorandum (BAP)]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Notice of Referral of Appeal to BAP]
  • June 03, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2021
  • May 16, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Referral of Appeal]
  • May 16, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Transmittal Memorandum]
  • May 14, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Transmittal Memorandum (BAP)]
  • May 14, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Notice of Referral of Appeal to BAP]
  • May 02, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion To Stay Pending Appeal]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Stay Pending Appeal]
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - ADV]
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Stay Pending Appeal - BK]
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Memorandum of Decision]
  • April 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Entered in Error - BK]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Memorandum of Decision - BK]
  • April 21, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Recusal]
  • April 09, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • April 07, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Response to Motion]
  • April 06, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • March 23, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Response to Motion]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Agreement to Allow Pro Se Party to File by E-mail]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Pro Se Debtor's Request to File by E-Mail]
  • March 11, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
  • March 08, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 06, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice]
  • March 06, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • March 05, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Notice - BK]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [2004 Examination]
  • March 03, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 03, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion for 2004 Examination]
  • March 01, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Recuse Judge - BK]
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion - BK]
  • February 19, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice]
  • February 19, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 18, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 16, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • February 01, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Add Judge]
January, 2021
  • January 31, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • January 31, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificiate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • January 29, 2021: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Application/Motion to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.