U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Armstrong et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 08, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Reply to Response]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • August 13, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • August 02, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order]
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 29, 2021: [Attachment]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order]
  • July 29, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • July 29, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 22, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 22, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 18, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 18, 2019: [Sentencing]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 20, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 19, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • December 19, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 06, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 03, 2018: [Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • November 28, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 19, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 13, 2018: [Rebuttal]
  • November 05, 2018: [Response]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 30, 2018: [Compel]
  • October 29, 2018: [Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 01, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 01, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 01, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 01, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 01, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • July 18, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 17, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • July 17, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 05, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 14, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 11, 2018: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 11, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 09, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 08, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • May 08, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 08, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 08, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 08, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 08, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 08, 2018: [Unseal Case]
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.