U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ratliff
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 03, 2021: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • May 03, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 19, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • April 19, 2021: [Unseal Document]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Remark]
  • March 04, 2019: [Letter]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 09, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 04, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 04, 2018: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 04, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • October 04, 2018: [Sentencing]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 16, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 25, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 25, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 25, 2018: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 25, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 18, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 18, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • June 07, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 08, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • May 08, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • May 08, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 08, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 03, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 03, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2018: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • May 03, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • May 03, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.