U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Black
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 10, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 02, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 02, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.