U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jenkins et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 31, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 23, 2017: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 23, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 23, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 14, 2017: [Restricted Document]
  • March 02, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 16, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 16, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2016: [Bond]
  • December 16, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 16, 2016: [Waiver]
  • December 16, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 16, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 14, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.