U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 05, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Sentencing]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 03, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 26, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • December 21, 2016: [Bond]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 09, 2016: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • December 09, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • December 09, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.