U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order]
  • January 29, 2018: [Letter]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Letter]
August, 2017
  • August 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 11, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 03, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 03, 2017: [Sentencing]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • May 05, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 05, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 05, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 06, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 20, 2017: [Suppress]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 01, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 01, 2017: [Continue]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 13, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • January 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • January 13, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 13, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 13, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • December 08, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • December 08, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.