U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Champion
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • June 24, 2020: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • October 07, 2019: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 02, 2019: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • October 01, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • September 03, 2019: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • September 03, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 28, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 26, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • August 26, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 20, 2019: [Subpoena Returned]
  • August 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 08, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2017
  • January 05, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 05, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 09, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 06, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 06, 2016: [Waiver]
  • December 06, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 06, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.