U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burns et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 06, 2021: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • May 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 03, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 03, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • May 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order to Unseal Document]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 15, 2021: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 19, 2020: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 16, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 16, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • November 16, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 09, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • August 31, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 21, 2020: [Response]
  • August 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 20, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • August 18, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • August 18, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 18, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 14, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 14, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 14, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Petition for Warrant/Summons (12C)]
  • July 13, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 18, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 17, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • August 16, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 16, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 16, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • August 16, 2017: [Sentencing]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 12, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 10, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 07, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 06, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 06, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 06, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 23, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • March 21, 2017: [Response]
  • March 15, 2017: [Bond]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • January 24, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 20, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 19, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 19, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 19, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 13, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 04, 2017: [Continue]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • December 12, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 12, 2016: [Waiver]
  • December 12, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 09, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 09, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 08, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 08, 2016: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order]
  • December 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 08, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 08, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 07, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 07, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 06, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.