U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Griffing
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 14, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 13, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • September 13, 2017: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • September 07, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • September 07, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • September 07, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 07, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 06, 2017: [Release from Custody]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 06, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • September 06, 2017: [Waiver]
  • September 06, 2017: [Unseal Document]
  • September 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • June 09, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 08, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 08, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 08, 2017: [Sentencing]
February, 2017
  • February 16, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 16, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 16, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 16, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 14, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
January, 2017
  • January 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 09, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 28, 2016: [Continue]
  • December 28, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 26, 2016: [Change Venue]
  • December 26, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 20, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 16, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • December 16, 2016: [Waiver]
  • December 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 15, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 15, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • December 06, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2016: [Bond]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2016: [Waiver]
  • December 06, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 06, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 06, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.