U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00002-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Givens et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 17, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 16, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • December 28, 2016: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • December 05, 2016: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.