U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:07-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • September 03, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [USCA Order]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • January 22, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • January 03, 2021: [Transcript - Redacted]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • December 22, 2020: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • December 18, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • December 09, 2020: [USCA Order]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 18, 2020: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • November 17, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 16, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 06, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • November 06, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • November 06, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • November 05, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • November 05, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 06, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 26, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 20, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 10, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 06, 2020: [Bond]
  • February 06, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • February 06, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 06, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 05, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 05, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 05, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 05, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 03, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Mail Returned]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Letter]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2017: [Letter]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Restricted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.