U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brooks et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • November 04, 2021: [Response in Support]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 08, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 19, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • February 03, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • January 22, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 20, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 14, 2020: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • October 14, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 14, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Rebuttal]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • June 01, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 21, 2020: [Order]
  • May 21, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • May 21, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Letter]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Order Epps Successive]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Letter]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Remark]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order]
  • June 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2017
  • August 04, 2017: [Letter]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.