U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whittle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 03, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 31, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 31, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 31, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 31, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 12, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 09, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 28, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 22, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 22, 2016: [Waiver]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2016: [Arrest]
  • November 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.