U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:00-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bunzy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 08, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 08, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 30, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 23, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 23, 2016: [Waiver]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.