U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00115-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Henderson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 22, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 22, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 07, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • March 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 07, 2022: [Restricted Document]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • February 04, 2022: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • February 04, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [USCA Order]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 07, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 16, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • August 15, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 08, 2017: [Transcript - Appeal]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Transcript Request]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 26, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 22, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 19, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 21, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • April 19, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • April 19, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Response to Order]
  • March 21, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • March 17, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 14, 2017: [Affidavit]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order]
  • November 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 21, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.