U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Schmitt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 14, 2018: [Digital Audio File (SEALED)]
  • January 12, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
March, 2017
  • March 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 23, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 23, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order]
  • March 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 23, 2017: [In Chambers Conference]
  • March 01, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • December 20, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 20, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 20, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 20, 2016: [Bond]
  • December 20, 2016: [Waiver]
  • December 20, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 08, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 17, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.