U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jenkins et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • April 15, 2025: [Compassionate Release]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • August 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 28, 2021: [Restricted Document]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 26, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 26, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 20, 2021: [Remark]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 30, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • July 30, 2018: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • July 24, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 25, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • June 25, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 30, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 29, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 24, 2017: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 24, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • June 14, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 14, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 14, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 13, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 24, 2017: [Continue]
  • April 06, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 05, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 28, 2017: [Continue]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • January 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 13, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 11, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 10, 2017: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 23, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order]
  • November 23, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 22, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 22, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 17, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • November 17, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.