U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Richards
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 13, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 13, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 20, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 20, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 20, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • March 20, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 17, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.