U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McKeel et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • October 12, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • September 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 24, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • August 10, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 20, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • July 10, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • July 10, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 09, 2020: [Rebuttal]
  • July 09, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 09, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • June 09, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 02, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 02, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 22, 2020: [Order]
  • May 22, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 19, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order]
  • May 18, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 14, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 25, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • August 25, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 24, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 24, 2017: [In Chambers Conference]
  • August 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 23, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • August 23, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 22, 2017: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 03, 2017: [Dismiss]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 13, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 12, 2017: [Continue]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 09, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 08, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 17, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 16, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • March 22, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 22, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 22, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 20, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 17, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 16, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 13, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 13, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 03, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Trial Order]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 10, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 28, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • November 28, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 28, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • November 17, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • November 17, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.