U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lilly
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 12, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 10, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 07, 2017: [Sentencing]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Order]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • June 12, 2017: [Response]
  • June 09, 2017: [Quash]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Order]
  • April 06, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 04, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 04, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 04, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 21, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 15, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • March 09, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 02, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 14, 2016: [Continue]
  • December 14, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 16, 2016: [Waiver]
  • November 16, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 16, 2016: [Unseal Case]
  • November 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2016: [Arraignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.