U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Granados
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 24, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • November 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • November 21, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 21, 2016: [Unseal Document]
  • November 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 16, 2016: [Case Inquiry Report]
  • November 16, 2016: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.