U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Myrick
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Attachment]
  • August 25, 2022: [Docket Call]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 14, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 09, 2017: [Letter]
  • November 09, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 09, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • November 09, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 01, 2017: [Continue]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 09, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • July 31, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 31, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 31, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 31, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • March 27, 2017: [Continue]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Order]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 12, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 12, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 04, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2016: [Bond]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 16, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 16, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 16, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 16, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 16, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • November 16, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.