U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Galaviz et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 15, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 10, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • May 05, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • May 05, 2017: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 04, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • May 04, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 04, 2017: [Sentencing]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 09, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 09, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 09, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 09, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 09, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2017
  • January 05, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 05, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 05, 2017: [Continue]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 13, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • December 13, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 13, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 13, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 13, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • December 12, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Redacted Document]
  • November 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 15, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.