U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pearson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 07, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 07, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 31, 2017: [Sentencing]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • May 02, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 02, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 02, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 05, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 04, 2017: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Bond]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 28, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • November 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 28, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 28, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 28, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 22, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 15, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • November 15, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • November 15, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.