U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gramajo-Gomez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 22, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 15, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 15, 2017: [Sentencing]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 09, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 09, 2017: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 09, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 09, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 09, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 04, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 23, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 23, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • November 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • November 15, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • November 15, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • November 15, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.